Hynes, Tyler Steven (CPSO#: 108225)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2016

Expiry Date:  30 Jun 2018

CPSO Registration Class: Postgraduate Education as of 23 Sep 2016

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Limerick, 2013

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Department of Medicine Mount Sinai
600 University Avenue
Suite 427
Toronto ON  M5G 2C4
Phone: 416 586 5133
Electoral District: 10

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. TYLER STEVEN HYNES shall practise medicine only as required by the postgraduate medical education program in which Dr. HYNES is enrolled at UNIVERSITY OF TORONTO;

(2) Dr. HYNES shall prescribe drugs only for in-patients or out-patients of a clinical teaching unit that is formally affiliated with the department where Dr. HYNES is properly practising medicine and to which postgraduate trainees are regularly assigned by the department as part of its program of postgraduate medical education;

(3) Dr. HYNES shall not charge a fee for medical services;

(4) The certificate expires on the earlier of the following times: when Dr. HYNES is no longer enrolled in a program of postgraduate medical education provided by a medical school in Ontario, or when Dr. HYNES no longer holds Canadian citizenship, permanent resident status or a valid employment authorization under the Immigration Act (Canada).

Note: This certificate expires on 30 Jun 2018.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

University of Toronto, 02 Nov 2015 to 14 Nov 2015
PEAP - Resident - Internal Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2016 to 22 Sep 2016
Assessment Verification Period - Internal Medicine

University of Toronto, 23 Sep 2016 to 30 Jun 2017
PostGrad Yr 1 - Internal Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2017 to 30 Jun 2018
PostGrad Yr 2 - Internal Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 04 Nov 2015
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 14 Nov 2015
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2016
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 23 Sep 2016
Expiry date attached to certificate of registration. Expiry Date: 30 Jun 2018