Hynscht, Harold Gunter (CPSO#: 55700)

Current Status: Active Member as of 17 Jun 1985

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 09 Jul 1986

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, German

Education:University of Toronto, 1985

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Dover Shores Family Practice
410 Main Street
Port Dover ON  N0A 1N0
Phone: (519) 583-0892
Fax: (519) 583-3981
Electoral District: 04
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Harold G. Hynscht Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Dec 11 2009

Shareholders:
Dr. H. Hynscht ( CPSO# 55700 )

Business Address:
410 Main Street
PO Box 279
Port Dover ON  N0A 1N0
Phone Number: (519) 583-0892

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. HAROLD GUNTER HYNSCHT may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. HYNSCHT is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

University of Toronto, 17 Jun 1985 to 16 Jun 1986
Other - Comprehensive Internship

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1986 to 30 Jun 1987
Resident 2 - Internal Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1988 to 30 Jun 1989
Resident 3 - Internal Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 17 Jun 1985
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 09 Jul 1986