Find A Doctor will be undergoing maintenance between 6:00pm on Friday, December 15, 2017 and 12:00 noon on Saturday, December 16, 2017. You may experience intermittent service interruptions during this time. We apologize for the inconvenience.

×Close

Hyshka, Sandra Ann (CPSO#: 67972)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 1994

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 21 Jun 1996

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Ottawa, 1994

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Medical Associates Of Port Perry
462 Paxton Street
Port Perry ON  L9L 1L9
Phone: (905) 985-2895
Fax: (844) 820-7076
Electoral District: 05
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: S. A. Hyshka Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jun 29 2006

Shareholders:
Dr. S. Hyshka ( CPSO# 67972 )

Business Address:
462 Paxton Street
Port Perry ON  L9L 1L9
Phone Number: (905) 985-2895


Corporation Name: Adams Gilmour Smith Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jul 13 2006

Shareholders:
Dr. F. Nasser-Sharif ( CPSO# 72700 )
Dr. G. Mercer ( CPSO# 60472 )
Dr. N. Kazarian ( CPSO# 71482 )
Dr. S. Hyshka ( CPSO# 67972 )
Dr. M. Gilmour ( CPSO# 59725 )
Dr. K. Ferguson ( CPSO# 76506 )
Dr. A. Dayal ( CPSO# 79055 )
Dr. R. Adams ( CPSO# 72364 )
Dr. F. Ali ( CPSO# 76181 )
Dr. R. Allin ( CPSO# 20746 )
Dr. K. Best ( CPSO# 75245 )
Dr. M. Brown ( CPSO# 69023 )
Dr. A. Brown ( CPSO# 59455 )
Dr. A. Chiella ( CPSO# 74700 )
Dr. M. Schurter ( CPSO# 82718 )
Dr. R. Wray ( CPSO# 86630 )
Dr. J. Ross ( CPSO# 88724 )
Dr. C. Westbrook ( CPSO# 89258 )
Dr. C. Hadden ( CPSO# 100522)
Dr. H. Nguyen ( CPSO# 88893 )
Dr. A. Gauster ( CPSO# 100273)
Dr. B. Tse ( CPSO# 91489 )
Dr. D. Wang ( CPSO# 90666 )
Dr. S. Cull ( CPSO# 82751 )
Dr. A. Armstrong ( CPSO# 84261 )
Dr. J. Tuck ( CPSO# 64782 )
Dr. T. Stryde ( CPSO# 73931 )
Dr. J. Stewart ( CPSO# 25659 )
Dr. M. Stewart ( CPSO# 62187 )
Dr. K. Smith ( CPSO# 66319 )
Dr. S. Shepherd ( CPSO# 71354 )
Dr. E. Russell ( CPSO# 59302 )
Dr. S. Russell ( CPSO# 60638 )
Dr. P. Puckrin ( CPSO# 27488 )
Dr. A. Pawley ( CPSO# 87461 )

Business Address:
Medical Associates of Port Perry
462 Paxton Street
Port Perry ON  L9L 1L9
Phone Number: (905) 985-2895

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Lakeridge Health Scugog Port Perry Site Port Perry

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. SANDRA ANN HYSHKA may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. HYSHKA is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 1994 to 30 Jun 1995
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 1995 to 30 Jun 1996
Resident 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1994
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 21 Jun 1996