Wagg, Ian Donald (CPSO#: 90903)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2009

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 27 Jun 2011

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Toronto, 2009

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Waypoint Centre for Mental
Health Care
500 Church Street
Penetanguishene ON  L9M 1G3
Phone: (705) 549-3181
Electoral District: 05
View more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

Georgian Bay General Hospital
1112 St. Andrew's Dr.
Midland ON  L4R 4P4
Canada
Phone: (705) 526-1300
Fax: (705) 526-4491
County: County of Simcoe
Electoral District: 05
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Mathai-Wagg Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Aug 06 2013

Shareholders:
Dr. A. Mathai ( CPSO# 95206 )
Dr. S. George ( CPSO# 30797 )
Dr. G. Mathai ( CPSO# 30723 )
Dr. B. Wagg ( CPSO# 29190 )
Dr. I. Wagg ( CPSO# 90903 )

Business Address:
Georgian Bay General Hospital
1112 St. Andrew's Drive
Midland ON  L4R 4P4
Phone Number: (705) 526-1300

Business Address:
Waypoint Centre for Mental Health Care
500 Church Street
Penetanguishene ON  L9M 1G3
Phone Number: (705) 549-3181

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Georgian Bay General Hospital Midland
Waypoint Centre for Mental Health Care Penetanguishene

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 24 Jun 2011 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. IAN DONALD WAGG may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. WAGG is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 3 - Family Medicine (Anaesthesia)

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2009
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 27 Jun 2011