Iannantuono, Biagio (CPSO#: 65121)

Current Status: Active Member as of 08 Jan 2010

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 02 Jul 1993

Indicates a concern or additional information

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, Italian

Education:The University of Western Ontario, 1992

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
South Muskoka Memorial Hospital
75 Ann Street
Bracebridge ON  P1L 2E4
Phone: (705) 646-1043
Fax: (705) 646-1473
Electoral District: 05
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Iannantuono and Kappos Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Mar 05 2012

Shareholders:
Dr. S. Kappos ( CPSO# 65611 )
Dr. B. Iannantuono ( CPSO# 65121 )

Business Address:
Archdekon Medical Group
Box 660
205 Hiram Street
Bracebridge ON  P1L 1T9
Phone Number: (705) 645-2223

Business Address:
9 Ann Street
Bracebridge ON  P1L 2E2
Phone Number: (705) 646-1043

Business Address:
South Muskoka Memorial Hospital
75 Ann Street
Bracebridge ON  P1L 2E4
Phone Number: (705) 646-1043

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Muskoka Algonquin Health Care,South Muskoka Memorial Site Bracebridge
Muskoka Algonquin Healthcare,Huntsville District Memorial Hospital Huntsville

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
General Surgery Effective: 30 Jun 1997 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. BIAGIO IANNANTUONO may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. IANNANTUONO is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

McMaster University, 01 Jul 1995 to 30 Jun 1996
Resident 4 - General Surgery

McMaster University, 01 Jul 1996 to 30 Jun 1997
Resident 5 - General Surgery

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1992
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 02 Jul 1993
Suspension of registration imposed: Discipline Committee Effective: 08 Dec 2009
Suspension of registration removed Effective: 08 Jan 2010

Previous Discipline Hearings

Committee: Discipline
Decision Date: 08 Dec 2009
Summary:

 On December 8, 2009, the Discipline Committee found that Dr. Iannantuono committed an act of 
 professional misconduct, in that he has engaged in conduct or an act or omission relevant to the 
 practice of medicine that, having regard to all the circumstances, would reasonably be regarded by 
 members as disgraceful, dishonourable or unprofessional.

Dr. Iannantuono, a general surgeon, had 
 his office nurse do postoperative examinations on patients following surgery, including hernia 
 repair patients. Ms. X was employed as a nurse in Dr. Iannantuono's office. In mid 2008, Dr. 
 Iannantuono spoke to Ms. X about her scrotal examinations and offered to assist her in learning 
 proper examination techniques by doing a scrotal examination on him. Ms. X rejected the idea and 
 was clearly uncomfortable with it. Dr. Iannantuono told Ms. X that no one needed to know about the 
 incident. Previous to this incident, another nurse employed by Dr. Iannantuono had performed a 
 practice scrotal examination on him.

The Discipline Committee ordered and directed that:

1.	The 
 Registrar suspend Dr. Iannantuono's certificate of registration for a period of one (1) month 
 commencing on the date of this Order.

2.	Dr. Iannantuono pay costs to the College in the amount 
 of $3,650 within thirty (30) days from the date of this Order. 

3.	The results of this proceeding 
 to be included in the register.

Decision: Download Full Decision (PDF)
Appeal: No Appeal
Hearing Date(s): December 8, 2009