Ibarra Moreno, Carlos Alberto (CPSO#: 111138)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Nov 2016

Expiry Date:  31 Dec 2017

CPSO Registration Class: PGE - Clinical Fellow as of 10 Jan 2017

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:Universidad Central De Venezuela, 1998

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
University Health Network
Toronto General Hospital
Department of Anesthesia and Pain M
200 Elizabeth Street, EN3-438
Toronto ON  M5G 2C4
Phone: (416) 340-3567
Fax: (416) 340-3698
Electoral District: 10

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. CARLOS ALBERTO IBARRA MORENO may practise medicine only as required by the clinical or research fellowship program in which Dr. IBARRA MORENO is enrolled at UNIVERSITY OF TORONTO;

(2) Dr. IBARRA MORENO shall prescribe drugs only for in-patients or out-patients of a clinical teaching unit that is formally affiliated with the department where Dr. IBARRA MORENO is properly practising medicine and to which postgraduate trainees are regularly assigned by the department as part of its program of postgraduate medical education;

(3) Dr. IBARRA MORENO shall not charge a fee for medical services;

(4) The certificate expires on the earliest of the following times:

(i) When Dr. IBARRA MORENO ceases to hold the appointment as a clinical or research fellow for which the certificate is issued,

(ii) When Dr. IBARRA MORENO ceases to hold Canadian citizenship, permanent resident status or a valid employment authorization under the Immigration Act (Canada), or

(iii) When three years have elapsed from the date the certificate is issued.

Note: This certificate expires on 31 Dec 2017.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Nov 2016 to 09 Jan 2017
PEAP - Clinical Fellow - Anesthesiology

University of Toronto, 10 Jan 2017 to 30 Jun 2017
Clinical Fellow - Anesthesiology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2017 to 31 Dec 2017
Clinical Fellow - Anesthesiology

University of Toronto, 01 Jan 2018 to 30 Jun 2018
Clinical Fellow - Anesthesiology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 01 Nov 2016
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 10 Jan 2017
Expiry date attached to certificate of registration. Expiry Date: 31 Dec 2017