Ibarra Rios, Daniel (CPSO#: 108406)

Current Status: Expired: Terms and conditions as of 31 Dec 2016

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 31 Dec 2016

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Education:National Autonomous University of Mexico, 2007

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jan 2016 to 16 Mar 2016
PEAP - Clinical Fellow - Neonatal-Perinatal Medicine

University of Toronto, 17 Mar 2016 to 30 Jun 2016
Clinical Fellow - Neonatal-Perinatal Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2016 to 31 Dec 2016
Clinical Fellow - Neonatal-Perinatal Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 06 Jan 2016
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 17 Mar 2016
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 31 Dec 2016