Ibrahim, Amir Abdulahi (CPSO#: 83306)

Current Status: Active Member as of 05 Jul 2011

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 05 Jul 2011

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: Amharic, English, German, Other, Russian

Education:Vinnitsa Medical Inst. N.Pirogov, 1991

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Suite 3101
222 King Street East
Bowmanville ON  L1C 1P6
Phone: (905) 697-0006
Fax: (905) 697-2552
Electoral District: 05
View more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

Lakeridge Health, Bowmanville Hospi
47 Liberty Street South,
Bowmanville ON  L1C 2N4
Canada
County: Regional Municipality of Durham
Electoral District: 05
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Amir Ibrahim Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Nov 16 2011

Shareholders:
Dr. A. Ibrahim ( CPSO# 83306 )

Business Address:
Suite 3101
222 King Street East
Bowmanville ON  L1C 1P6
Phone Number: (905) 697-0006

Business Address:
47 Liberty Street
Bowmanville ON  L1C 2N4

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Lakeridge Health,Clarington Site Bowmanville

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
General Surgery Effective: 30 Jun 2011 RCPSC Specialist
Medical Microbiology Effective: 16 May 2017 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. AMIR ABDULAHI IBRAHIM may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. IBRAHIM is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2005 to 30 Jun 2006
PostGrad Yr 1 - General Surgery

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2006 to 30 Jun 2007
PostGrad Yr 2 - General Surgery

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2007 to 30 Jun 2008
PostGrad Yr 3 - General Surgery

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2008 to 30 Jun 2009
PostGrad Yr 4 - General Surgery

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
PostGrad Yr 5 - General Surgery

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
PostGrad Yr 5 - General Surgery

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2005
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 2011
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 05 Jul 2011