Ibrahim, Jamal Muhieddine (CPSO#: 66148)

Current Status: Expired: Terms and conditions as of 30 Jun 1998

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 30 Jun 1998

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Education:Ain Shams University, 1986

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Ottawa, 01 Jan 1993 to 30 Jun 1993
Resident 1 - Urology

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 1993 to 31 Dec 1993
Resident 1 - Urology

University of Ottawa, 01 Jan 1994 to 31 Dec 1994
Resident 2 - Urology

University of Ottawa, 01 Jan 1995 to 30 Jun 1995
Resident 3 - Urology

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 1995 to 31 Dec 1995
Resident 3 - Urology

University of Ottawa, 01 Jan 1996 to 30 Jun 1996
Resident 4 - Urology

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 1996 to 31 Dec 1996
Resident 4 - Urology

University of Toronto, 01 Jan 1997 to 30 Jun 1997
Clinical Fellow - Urology

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Oct 1997 to 30 Jun 1998
Clinical Fellow - Urology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 11 Dec 1992
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 1997
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 05 Nov 1997
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 1998