Ibrahim Khalil, Ayman Mohamed (CPSO#: 81891)

Current Status: Expired: Terms and conditions as of 31 Dec 2006

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 31 Dec 2006

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Education:Ain Shams University, 1998

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

McMaster University, 01 Aug 2004 to 18 Oct 2004
PEAP - Clinical Fellow - Diagnostic Radiology

McMaster University, 19 Oct 2004 to 30 Jun 2005
Clinical Fellow - Diagnostic Radiology

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2005 to 30 Jun 2006
Clinical Fellow - Diagnostic Radiology

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2006 to 31 Dec 2006
Clinical Fellow - Diagnostic Radiology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 03 Sep 2004
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 18 Oct 2004
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 25 Oct 2004
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 31 Dec 2006