Ibrahim, Mohammed Aslam (CPSO#: 32023)

Current Status: Active Member as of 17 Oct 1980

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 17 Oct 1980

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, Hindi, Panjabi/Punjabi, Urdu

Education:University of Glasgow, 1972

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Suite 216
2120 North Park Drive
Brampton ON  L6S 0C9
Phone: (905) 453-3251
Fax: (905) 453-9623
Electoral District: 05
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: M.A. Ibrahim Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: Dec 19 2014


Corporation Name: Mohamed A. Ibrahim Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Dec 22 2014

Shareholders:
Dr. M. Ibrahim ( CPSO# 32023 )

Business Address:
Suite 216
2120 North Park Drive
Brampton ON  L6S 0C9
Phone Number: (905) 453-3251

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Urology Effective: 16 Nov 1981 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. MOHAMMED ASLAM IBRAHIM may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. IBRAHIM is educated and experienced.

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1976
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 17 Oct 1980