Ibrahim, Moheb Samir (CPSO#: 67564)

Current Status: Active Member as of 27 Sep 2002

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 27 Sep 2002

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: Arabic, English, French

Education:Asyut University, 1981

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Children's Hospital of Estern Ontar
401 Smyth Road
Ottawa ON  K1H 8L1
Phone: 613-737-7600
Electoral District: 07
Find more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

713 Montreal Rd
Ottawa ON  K1K 0T2
Canada
County: Regional Municipality of Ottawa-Carleton
Electoral District: 07

101 Humber College BLVD
Etobicoke ON  M9V 1R8
Canada
Phone: (416) 494-2120
County: City of Toronto
Electoral District: 10

2100 Bovaird Drive
Brampton ON  L6R 3J7
Canada
Phone: (905) 789-8271
County: Regional Municipality of Peel
Electoral District: 05
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Moheb Ibrahim Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Aug 09 2007

Shareholders:
Dr. M. Ibrahim ( CPSO# 67564 )

Business Address:
2100 Bovaird Drive East
Brampton ON  L6R 3J7

Business Address:
101 Humber College Boulevard
Etobicoke ON  M9V 1R8

Business Address:
401 Smyth Road
Ottawa ON  K1H 8L1
Phone Number: (613) 737-7600

Business Address:
713 Montreal Road
Ottawa ON  K1K 0T2
Phone Number: (613) 746-4621

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Children's Hospital of Eastern Ontario Ottawa
Montfort Hospital Ottawa
William Osler Health Centre Etobicoke General Site Toronto
William Osler Health Centre-Brampton Civic Hospital Brampton

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Cardiac Surgery Effective: 31 Dec 2001 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. MOHEB SAMIR IBRAHIM may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. IBRAHIM is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

University of Ottawa, 01 Sep 1993 to 30 Jun 1994
Clinical Fellow - Cardiovascular and Thoracic Surgery

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 1994 to 29 Aug 1994
Clinical Fellow - Cardiovascular and Thoracic Surgery

University of Ottawa, 29 Aug 1994 to 30 Jun 1995
Clinical Fellow - Cardiovascular and Thoracic Surgery

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 1999 to 30 Jun 2000
PostGrad Yr 4 - Cardiac Surgery

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2000 to 30 Jun 2001
PostGrad Yr 5 - Cardiac Surgery

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2001 to 31 Dec 2001
PostGrad Yr 6 - Cardiac Surgery

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 28 Oct 1993
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 1995
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1999
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 31 Dec 2001
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 27 Sep 2002