Ibrahim, Salwa Nasry Kamel (CPSO#: 66457)

Current Status: Active Member as of 04 Jan 1996

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 04 Jan 1996

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: Arabic, English

Education:University of Alexandria, 1983

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
3410 Sheppard Avenue East
Suite 209
Scarborough ON  M1T 3K4
Phone: (416) 293-4942
Fax: (416) 293-9100
Electoral District: 10
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Salwa Ibrahim Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jun 25 2007

Shareholders:
Dr. S. Ibrahim ( CPSO# 66457 )

Business Address:
209 - 3410 Sheppard Avenue East
Scarborough ON  M1T 3K4
Phone Number: (416) 293-4942

Business Address:
The Scarborough Hospital - Grace Campus
3030 Birchmount Road
Scarborough ON  M1W 3W3
Phone Number: (416) 495-2400

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Scarborough Hospital-Birchmount Campus Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 04 Dec 1995 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. SALWA NASRY KAMEL IBRAHIM may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. IBRAHIM is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1993 to 30 Jun 1994
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1994 to 30 Jun 1995
Resident 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1993
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 1995
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 04 Jan 1996