Ibrahim, Shahnaz Hamid (CPSO#: 76864)

Current Status: Expired: Committee terms and conditions as of 12 Dec 2004

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 12 Dec 2004

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Karachi, 1985

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2001 to 30 Jun 2002
Clinical Fellow - Paediatric Neurology

University of Toronto, 13 Sep 2004 to 12 Dec 2004
Clinical Fellow - Paediatric Neurology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 13 Jul 2001
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 2002
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 15 Sep 2004
Expiry date attached to certificate of registration. Expiry Date: 12 Dec 2004
Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate Effective: 12 Dec 2004