Ibrahim, Sirar (CPSO#: 95631)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2015

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 01 Jul 2015

Summary

Former Name: Al-Yahya, Sirar Kais Ibrahim (used until: 07 Nov 2012 )

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: Arabic, English, French

Education:University of Al-Mustansiriyah, 1992

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Northumberland Hills Hospital
1000 DePalma Drive
Cobourg ON  K9A 5W6
Phone: (905) 372-6811 Ext. 3140
Fax: 9053736975
Electoral District: 06
Find more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

601 Harwood Avenue South
Suite 201
Ajax ON  L1S 2J5
Canada
Phone: 9054271419
Fax: 9054270346
County: Regional Municipality of Durham
Electoral District: 05

197 Third Street
Cobourg ON  K9A3L5
Canada
Phone: 905-373-1227
Fax: 905-373-4062
County: County of Northumberland
Electoral District: 06
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Sirar Ibrahim Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Aug 31 2015

Shareholders:
Dr. S. Ibrahim ( CPSO# 95631 )

Business Address:
Northumberland Hills Hospital
1000 DePalma Drive
Suite 1J16
Cobourg ON  K9A 5W6
Phone Number: (905) 372-6811

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Northumberland Hills Hospital,Cobourg District General Site Cobourg

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective: 30 Jun 2014 RCPSC Specialist
Respirology Effective: 19 Oct 2015 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. SIRAR IBRAHIM may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. IBRAHIM is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2011 to 22 Sep 2011
Assessment Verification Period - Internal Medicine

University of Toronto, 23 Sep 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 2 - Internal Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 3 - Internal Medicine

McMaster University, 09 Feb 2015 to 08 Mar 2015
Elective Trainee - Respiratory Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2011
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 23 Sep 2011
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 2013
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 09 Feb 2015
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 08 Mar 2015
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2015