Ichise, Masanori (CPSO#: 32199)

Current Status: Expired: Resigned from membership as of 01 Jun 2013

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 01 Jun 2013

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, Japanese

Education:University of Toronto, 1979

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Diagnostic Radiology Effective: 23 Nov 1984 RCPSC Specialist
Nuclear Medicine Effective: 23 Nov 1987 RCPSC Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 18 Jun 1979
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 18 Feb 1981
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 01 Jun 2013