Ickowicz, Abel (CPSO#: 52224)

Current Status: Active Member as of 14 Apr 1982

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 11 Aug 1986

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, Spanish

Education:University of Costa Rica, 1978

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Department Of Psychiatry
The Hospital For Sick Children
555 University Avenue
Toronto ON  M5G 1X8
Phone: (416) 813-6936
Fax: (416) 813-5326
Electoral District: 10
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Abel Ickowicz Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jun 29 2016

Shareholders:
Dr. A. Ickowicz ( CPSO# 52224 )

Business Address:
The Hospital for Sick Children
Department of Psychiatry
555 University Avenue
Toronto ON  M5G 1X8
Phone Number: (416) 813-6936

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Hospital For Sick Children Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Psychiatry Effective: 09 Jun 1986 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. ABEL ICKOWICZ may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. ICKOWICZ is educated and experienced.

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 14 Apr 1982
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 1986
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 11 Aug 1986