Iconomou, Thomais George (CPSO#: 70987)

Current Status: Expired: Terms and conditions as of 31 Dec 1997

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 31 Dec 1997

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Education:National and Capodistrias Univ of Athens, 1984

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jan 1997 to 30 Jun 1997
Clinical Fellow - Plastic Surgery

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1997 to 31 Dec 1997
Clinical Fellow - Plastic Surgery

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 10 Feb 1997
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 31 Dec 1997