Idais, Iyad Mohammed Abed El Hameed (CPSO#: 87531)

Current Status: Expired: Terms and conditions as of 30 Jan 2009

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 30 Jan 2009

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Education:Baskirian State Medical University, 1998

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Ottawa, 01 Aug 2007 to 23 Oct 2007
PEAP - Clinical Fellow - Anesthesiology

University of Ottawa, 24 Oct 2007 to 31 Jul 2008
Clinical Fellow - Anesthesiology

University of Ottawa, 01 Aug 2008 to 30 Jan 2009
Clinical Fellow - Anesthesiology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 02 Aug 2007
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 23 Oct 2007
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 24 Oct 2007
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jan 2009