Idikio, Halliday Amabebe Azubuike (CPSO#: 45771)

Current Status: Expired: Resigned from membership as of 07 Jun 2012

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 07 Jun 2012

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Ibadan, 1971

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Anatomical Pathology Effective: 30 Nov 1977 RCPSC Specialist

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1977 to 30 Jun 1978
Resident 1 - General Pathology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1976
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 1978
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 27 Jul 1999
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 07 Jun 2012