Iftikhar, Asma (CPSO#: 81621)

Current Status: Active Member as of 10 Jul 2006

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 10 Jul 2006

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English, Hindi, Panjabi/Punjabi, Urdu

Education:Punjab University, Pakistan, 1986

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Park Royal Plaza
2425 Truscott Drive
Mississauga ON  L5J 2B4
Phone: (905) 823-5020
Fax: (905) 823-3443
Electoral District: 05
View more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

5380 terry fox way
unit 10
MISSISSAUGA
ONATRIO
Mississauga ON  L5V 0A5
Canada
Phone: (905) 858 3030
Fax: (905) 8583031
County: Regional Municipality of Peel
Electoral District: 05
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Asma Iftikhar Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Nov 10 2009

Shareholders:
Dr. A. Iftikhar ( CPSO# 81621 )

Business Address:
Park Royal Medical Office
2425 Truscott Drive
Mississauga ON  L5J 2B4
Phone Number: (905) 823-5020

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Trillium Health Partners,Mississauga Hospital Mississauga

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 07 Jul 2006 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. ASMA IFTIKHAR may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. IFTIKHAR is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2004 to 30 Jun 2005
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2005 to 30 Jun 2006
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 02 Jul 2004
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 2006
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 10 Jul 2006