Iglar, Karl (CPSO#: 63887)

Current Status: Active Member as of 17 Jun 1991

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 14 Jul 1992


Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, Polish

Education:University of Toronto, 1991

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
St Michael's Hospital
30 Bond Street
Toronto ON  M5B 1W8
Phone: (416) 867-7428
Fax: (416) 867-7498
Electoral District: 10

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
St Michael's Hospital Toronto


Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 08 Jun 1993 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions


(1) Dr. KARL IGLAR may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. IGLAR is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 17 Jun 1991 to 15 Jun 1992
Other - Comprehensive Internship

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1992 to 30 Jun 1993
Resident 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 17 Jun 1991
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 14 Jul 1992