Iglesias Jr., Marcos Alfonso (CPSO#: 58043)

Current Status: Expired: Resigned from membership as of 10 Aug 1990

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 10 Aug 1990

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Unknown

Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Education:University of Toronto, 1987

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1988 to 30 Jun 1989
Resident 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 15 Jun 1987
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 06 Oct 1988
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 10 Aug 1990