Igoa Osorio, Jose Esteban (CPSO#: 50830)

Current Status: Active Member as of 02 May 1985

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 02 May 1985

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, Spanish

Education:National Autonomous University of Mexico, 1976

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Suite 103
3600 North 23rd Street
McAllen TX  78501
United States
Phone: (956) 682-4401
Fax: (956) 684-9081

Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.

USA - Arizona
USA - Florida
USA - Louisiana
USA - Texas

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Psychiatry Effective: 28 Nov 1984 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. JOSE ESTEBAN IGOA OSORIO may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. IGOA OSORIO is educated and experienced.

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1980
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 1984
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 02 May 1985