Ikejiani, Charles Essien (CPSO#: 75705)

Current Status: Active Member as of 05 Oct 2000

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 05 Oct 2000

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:Dalhousie University, 1995

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Suite 209
5 Quarry Ridge Road
Barrie ON  L4M 7G1
Phone: (705) 727-4050
Fax: (705) 727-4055
Electoral District: 05
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Charles Ikejiani Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jun 19 2008

Shareholders:
Dr. C. Ikejiani ( CPSO# 75705 )

Business Address:
Suite 209
5 Quarry Ridge Road
Barrie ON  L4M 7G1
Phone Number: (705) 727-4050

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Royal Victoria Regional Health Centre Barrie

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Orthopedic Surgery Effective: 21 Jun 2000 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. CHARLES ESSIEN IKEJIANI may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. IKEJIANI is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 16 Oct 2000 to 30 Jun 2001
Clinical Fellow - Orthopedic Surgery

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 05 Oct 2000