Ikeman, Robert Lewis (CPSO#: 54613)

Current Status: Expired: Resigned from membership as of 06 Jun 2013

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 06 Jun 2013

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:McGill University, 1981

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective: 19 Jun 1985 RCPSC Specialist
Rheumatology Effective: 26 Nov 1986 RCPSC Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1984
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 03 Jan 1986
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 06 Jun 2013