Ikizler, Yasemin (CPSO#: 66487)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 1993

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 16 Oct 1995


Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Toronto, 1993

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Suite 306
27 Roncesvalles Avenue
Toronto ON  M6R 3B2
Phone: (416) 761-0133
Fax: (416) 761-1915
Electoral District: 10
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Ikizler Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jan 30 2015

Dr. Y. Ikizler ( CPSO# 66487 )

Business Address:
Suite 306
27 Roncesvalles Avenue
Toronto ON  M6R 3B2
Phone Number: (416) 761-0133

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
St Joseph's Health Centre,Toronto Toronto


Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 09 Jun 1995 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions


(1) Dr. YASEMIN IKIZLER may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. IKIZLER is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1993 to 30 Jun 1994
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1994 to 30 Jun 1995
Resident 2 - Family Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1995 to 28 Jun 1996
Resident 3 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1993
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 16 Oct 1995