Ilk, Lisa Anne (CPSO#: 79425)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2003

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 21 Jun 2005

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Toronto, 2003

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
10 Gateway Boulevard
Don Mills ON  M3C 3A1
Phone: (416) 429-4991
Fax: (416) 422-3573
Electoral District: 10
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Lisa Ilk Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jan 07 2011

Shareholders:
Dr. L. Ilk ( CPSO# 79425 )

Business Address:
10 Gateway Boulevard
Don Mills ON  M3C 3A1
Phone Number: (416) 429-4991

Business Address:
825 Coxwell Avenue
Toronto ON  M4C 3E7

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Michael Garron Hospital - Toronto East Health Network Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 15 Jun 2005 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. LISA ANNE ILK may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. ILK is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

Queen's University, 01 Jul 2003 to 30 Jun 2004
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

Queen's University, 01 Jul 2004 to 30 Jun 2005
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2003
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 21 Jun 2005