Illamperuma, Chamani (CPSO#: 88034)

Current Status: Active Member as of 17 Jan 2008

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 17 Jan 2008

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English, Sinhala

Education:University of Colombo, 2000

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
129 Church St South
Richmond Hill ON  L4C 1W4
Phone: (905) 884-0977
Fax: (905) 884-6454
Electoral District: 05
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: C. Illamperuma Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Oct 02 2013

Shareholders:
Dr. C. Illamperuma ( CPSO# 88034 )

Business Address:
10 Trench Street
Richmond Hill ON  L4C 0S7
Phone Number: (905) 883-1212

Business Address:
129 Church Street South
Richmond Hill ON  L4C 1W4
Phone Number: (905) 884-0977

Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.

USA - Indiana

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Mackenzie Health,Richmond Hill Richmond Hill

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective: 31 Jul 2007 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. CHAMANI ILLAMPERUMA may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. ILLAMPERUMA is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

University of Ottawa, 01 Apr 2008 to 30 Apr 2008
Elective Trainee - Respirology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 17 Jan 2008