Find A Doctor will be undergoing maintenance between 6:00pm on Friday, December 15, 2017 and 12:00 noon on Saturday, December 16, 2017. You may experience intermittent service interruptions during this time. We apologize for the inconvenience.

×Close

Illing, Leigh Harvey Gerhard (CPSO#: 61545)

Current Status: Expired: Terms and conditions as of 30 Jun 1990

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 30 Jun 1990

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Unknown

Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Education:University of Cape Town, 1984

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Anesthesiology Effective: 03 Jun 1991 RCPSC Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Aug 1989
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 1990