Ilo, Mary de Porres (CPSO#: 86107)

Current Status: Active Member as of 30 Apr 2007

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 30 Apr 2007

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English, Igbo, Italian

Education:Universita Cattolica del Sacro Cuore, 1994

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Brantford General Hospital
200 Terrace Hill Street
Brantford ON  N3R 1G9
Phone: (519) 751-5544 Ext. 5858
Fax: (519) 751-5570
Electoral District: 04

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Brant Community Healthcare System Brantford
Brant Community Healthcare System,Willett Site Paris

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 06 Dec 2006 CFPC Specialist
Family Medicine (Emergency Medicine) Effective: 12 Oct 2011 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. MARY DE PORRES ILO may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. ILO is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
PostGrad Yr 3 - Emergency Medicine

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2010 to 31 Jul 2010
PostGrad Yr 3 - Emergency Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Apr 2007