Iloreta, Santos Tabutol (CPSO#: 51976)

Current Status: Expired: Resigned from membership as of 20 Jul 1992

CPSO Registration Class: None as of

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, French, Tagalog

Education:University of Santo Tomas, 1975

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Anatomical Pathology Effective: 14 Dec 1988 RCPSC Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 03 Jan 1983
Transfer of class of registration to: Hospital Practice Certificate Effective: 09 May 1989
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 24 Aug 1990
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 20 Jul 1992