Ilse, Werner Konstantin (CPSO#: 52680)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 1983

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 07 Jan 1986

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: Afrikaans, Dutch, English, French

Education:The University of Western Ontario, 1983

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
H S C - G E 248
820 Sherbrook Street
Winnipeg MB  R3A 1R9
Phone: (204) 787-7252
Fax: (204) 787-5158

Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.

Manitoba

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective: 13 Jun 1989 RCPSC Specialist
Neurology Effective: 23 Nov 1992 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. WERNER KONSTANTIN ILSE may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. ILSE is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

McMaster University, 01 Jul 1983 to 30 Jun 1984
Other - Internal Medicine

McMaster University, 01 Jul 1984 to 30 Jun 1985
Resident 2 - Internal Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1985 to 30 Jun 1986
Resident 2 - Anatomical Pathology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1986 to 30 Jun 1987
Resident 2 - Neuropathology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1987 to 30 Jun 1988
Resident 5 - Internal Medicine

McMaster University, 01 Jul 1988 to 30 Jun 1989
Resident 4 - Neurology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1989 to 30 Jun 1990
Resident 4 - Neurology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1990 to 30 Jun 1991
Resident 4 - Neurology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1991 to 30 Jun 1992
Resident 5 - Neurology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1992 to 30 Jun 1993
Clinical Fellow - Neurology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1993 to 30 Sep 1993
Clinical Fellow - Neurology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1983
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 07 Jan 1986