Ilves, Riivo (CPSO#: 26597)

Current Status: Expired: Emeritus status as of 02 Jun 2014

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 02 Jun 2014

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, Estonian

Education:University of Toronto, 1973

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
General Surgery Effective: 14 Nov 1978 RCPSC Specialist
Thoracic Surgery Effective: 01 Dec 1981 RCPSC Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 18 Jun 1973
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 25 Jun 1974
Expired: Failure to Renew Membership Expiry: 09 Aug 2008
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 16 Nov 2011
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 02 Jun 2014