Imola, Mario Joseph (CPSO#: 58040)

Current Status: Expired: Resigned from membership as of 28 Jul 2016

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 28 Jul 2016

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, Italian

Education:University of Toronto, 1987

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.

USA - Colorado

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Otolaryngology - Head and Neck Surgery Effective: 05 Sep 1996 RCPSC Specialist

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 15 Jun 1987 to 13 Jun 1988
Other - Comprehensive Internship

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 1988 to 30 Jun 1989
Resident 1 - Otolaryngology - Head and Neck Surgery

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 1989 to 30 Jun 1990
Resident 2 - Otolaryngology - Head and Neck Surgery

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 1990 to 30 Jun 1991
Resident 3 - Otolaryngology - Head and Neck Surgery

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 1991 to 30 Jun 1992
Resident 4 - Otolaryngology - Head and Neck Surgery

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1992 to 30 Jun 1993
Clinical Fellow - Otolaryngology - Head and Neck Surgery

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 15 Jun 1987
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 06 May 1989
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 28 Jul 2016