Imran, Aatika (CPSO#: 94183)

Current Status: Active Member as of 15 Jan 2013

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 15 Jan 2013

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English, Hindi, Panjabi/Punjabi, Urdu

Education:Quaid-i-Azam University, 2005

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
358 Oxford Street East
London ON  N6A 1V7
Phone: (519) 438 0002
Fax: (519) 438 0888
Electoral District: 02
Find more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

Unit 7, 1355 Huron street
London ON  N5W2Z1
Canada
Phone: (519) 659 6399
Fax: 519-659-9930
County: County of Middlesex
Electoral District: 02
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Aatika Imran Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Dec 18 2013

Shareholders:
Dr. A. Imran ( CPSO# 94183 )

Business Address:
358 Oxford Street East
London ON  N6A 1V7
Phone Number: (519) 438-0002

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 14 Jan 2013 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. AATIKA IMRAN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. IMRAN is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

The University of Western Ontario, 08 Jul 2010 to 30 Sep 2010
Assessment Verification Period - Family Medicine

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Oct 2010 to 07 Jul 2011
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

The University of Western Ontario, 08 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2012 to 31 Dec 2012
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 08 Jul 2010
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Oct 2010
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 31 Dec 2012
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 15 Jan 2013