Imrie, John David (CPSO#: 22004)

Current Status: Expired: Resigned from membership as of 17 Jun 2015

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 17 Jun 2015

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Toronto, 1968

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Medical Records Location

Instructions: Dr. Imrie’s medical record requests can be requested by emailing him at davidimheath@gmail.com . If a patient does not have access to email, the College can write to Dr. Imrie directly.
Date Received: 22 May 2013

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 15 Jun 1968
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 14 Jun 1969
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 26 Jun 1969
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 17 Jun 2015