Imtirat, Ahed (CPSO#: 111273)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jan 2017

Expiry Date:  31 Dec 2017

CPSO Registration Class: PGE - Clinical Fellow as of 26 Mar 2017

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:The Hebrew University, 2007

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
The Hospital for Sick Children
Department of Ophthalmology
and Vision Sciences
555 University Avenue
Toronto ON  M5G 1X8
Phone: (416) 813-1500
Electoral District: 10

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. AHED IMTIRAT may practise medicine only as required by the clinical or research fellowship program in which Dr. IMTIRAT is enrolled at UNIVERSITY OF TORONTO;

(2) Dr. IMTIRAT shall prescribe drugs only for in-patients or out-patients of a clinical teaching unit that is formally affiliated with the department where Dr. IMTIRAT is properly practising medicine and to which postgraduate trainees are regularly assigned by the department as part of its program of postgraduate medical education;

(3) Dr. IMTIRAT shall not charge a fee for medical services;

(4) The certificate expires on the earliest of the following times:

(i) When Dr. IMTIRAT ceases to hold the appointment as a clinical or research fellow for which the certificate is issued,

(ii) When Dr. IMTIRAT ceases to hold Canadian citizenship, permanent resident status or a valid employment authorization under the Immigration Act (Canada), or

(iii) When three years have elapsed from the date the certificate is issued.

Note: This certificate expires on 31 Dec 2017.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jan 2017 to 25 Mar 2017
PEAP - Clinical Fellow - Ophthalmology

University of Toronto, 26 Mar 2017 to 30 Jun 2017
Clinical Fellow - Ophthalmology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2017 to 31 Dec 2017
Clinical Fellow - Ophthalmology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 01 Jan 2017
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 26 Mar 2017
Expiry date attached to certificate of registration. Expiry Date: 31 Dec 2017