Incardona, Nadia Kristina (CPSO#: 84414)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2006

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 23 Jun 2008

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:Queen's University, 2006

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Toronto East General Hospital
825 Coxwell Avenue
Toronto ON  M4C 3E7
Phone: (416) 469-6580
Electoral District: 10

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Englehart and District Hospital Englehart
Michael Garron Hospital - Toronto East Health Network Toronto
Red Lake Margaret Cochenour Memorial Hospital Red Lake
West Parry Sound Health Centre Parry Sound

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 19 Jun 2008 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. NADIA KRISTINA INCARDONA may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. INCARDONA is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2006 to 30 Jun 2007
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2007 to 30 Jun 2008
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

University of Toronto, 02 Apr 2012 to 30 Jun 2012
Clinical Fellow - Emergency Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2006
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 23 Jun 2008