Inch, Cameron James Arthur (CPSO#: 71145)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 1997

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 19 Jun 1999

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, French

Education:The University of Western Ontario, 1997

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Front Frederick Health
14th Floor
365 Bloor Street East
Toronto ON  M4W 3L4
Phone: (416) 362-8777
Fax: (416) 362-7879
Electoral District: 10
View more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

Suite 400
1 Eglinton Avenue East
Toronto ON  M4P 3A1
Canada
Phone: (416) 440-2800
Fax: (416) 733-3321
County: City of Toronto
Electoral District: 10

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 15 Jun 1999 CFPC Specialist
Family Medicine (Emergency Medicine) Effective: 01 Dec 2002 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. CAMERON JAMES ARTHUR INCH may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. INCH is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1997 to 30 Jun 1998
PostGrad Yr 1 - Community Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1998 to 30 Jun 1999
PostGrad Yr 2 - Community Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1999 to 30 Jun 2000
PostGrad Yr 3 - Community Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2000 to 30 Jun 2001
PostGrad Yr 4 - Community Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jun 2001 to 30 Jun 2002
PostGrad Yr 3 - Family Medicine (Emergency Medicine)

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1997
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 19 Jun 1999