Incze, Peter Ferenc (CPSO#: 63640)

Current Status: Active Member as of 19 Jun 1992

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 19 Jun 1992

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:McMaster University, 1991

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Suite 407
1235 Trafalgar Road North
Oakville ON  L6M 3V4
Phone: (905) 842-1393
Fax: (905) 338-3150
Electoral District: 04
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Incze Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Aug 27 2003

Shareholders:
Dr. P. Incze ( CPSO# 63640 )

Business Address:
407 - 1235 Trafalgar Road North
Oakville ON  L6H 3P1
Phone Number: (905) 842-1393

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Oakville Trafalgar Memorial Hospital Oakville

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Urology Effective: 24 Aug 1997 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. PETER FERENC INCZE may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. INCZE is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1995 to 30 Jun 1996
Resident 3 - Urology

University of Toronto, 18 Dec 1997 to 30 Jun 1998
Clinical Fellow - Urology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 17 Jun 1991
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 15 Jun 1992
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 19 Jun 1992