Indar, Rupert Arjoon (CPSO#: 86077)

Current Status: Expired: Terms and conditions as of 25 Jan 2008

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 25 Jan 2008

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Education:University of London, 1995

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Apr 2007 to 23 Jun 2007
PEAP - Clinical Fellow - Orthopedic Surgery

University of Toronto, 24 Jun 2007 to 30 Jun 2007
Clinical Fellow - Orthopedic Surgery

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2007 to 25 Jan 2008
Clinical Fellow - Orthopedic Surgery

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 16 Apr 2007
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 23 Jun 2007
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 12 Jul 2007
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 25 Jan 2008
Expiry date attached to certificate of registration. Expiry Date: 25 Jun 2008