Indrajit, Sivarajini (CPSO#: 78864)

Current Status: Active Member as of 19 Apr 2004

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 19 Apr 2004

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English, Tamil

Education:University of Jaffna, 1996

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Bay Medical Centre
Runaway Bay Shopping Village
Runaway Bay
QLD 4214
Gold Coast 4214
Australia
Phone: 617 55291966

Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.

Australia

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 15 Apr 2004 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. SIVARAJINI INDRAJIT may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. INDRAJIT is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 26 Feb 2003 to 25 Mar 2003
Elective Trainee - Diagnostic Radiology

University of Toronto, 26 Mar 2003 to 08 Apr 2003
Elective Trainee - Emergency Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 26 Feb 2003
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 08 Apr 2003
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 19 Apr 2004