Indrakrishnan, Bhuvanendram (CPSO#: 65552)

Current Status: Expired: Resigned from membership as of 25 Jun 2001

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 25 Jun 2001

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, Sinhala, Tamil

Education:University of Colombo, 1985

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective: 17 Nov 1993 RCPSC Specialist

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

Queen's University, 01 Jul 1994 to 30 Jun 1995
Resident 5 - Gastroenterology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1992
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 23 Dec 1993
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 25 Jun 2001