Ing, Alan (CPSO#: 57428)

Current Status: Active Member as of 02 Dec 1987

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 18 Feb 1988

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Toronto, 1978

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Markham Stouffville Health Centre
377 Church Street
Suite 402
Markham ON  L6B 1A1
Phone: (905) 472-7122
Electoral District: 05
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Alan Ing Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Aug 11 2009

Shareholders:
Dr. A. Ing ( CPSO# 57428 )

Business Address:
Markham Stouffville Health Centre
402 - 377 Church Street
Markham ON  L6B 1A1
Phone Number: (905) 472-7122

Business Address:
381 Church Street
PO Box 1800
Markham ON  L3P 7P3
Phone Number: (905) 472-7000

Business Address:
4 Campbell Drive
Uxbridge ON  L9P 1S4
Phone Number: (905) 852-9771

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Markham Stouffville Hospital Markham
Southlake Regional Health Centre Newmarket

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
General Surgery Effective: 18 Nov 1987 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. ALAN ING may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. ING is educated and experienced.

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1986
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 1987
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 02 Dec 1987
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 18 Feb 1988