Ing, Douglas Jeffrey (CPSO#: 63916)

Current Status: Active Member as of 17 Jun 1991

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 14 Sep 1992

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Toronto, 1991

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
University Health Network
Toronto General Campus
3 P M C C 522
150 Gerrard Street West
Toronto ON  M5G 2C4
Phone: (416) 340-5237
Fax: (416) 340-4710
Electoral District: 10
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Douglas J. Ing Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Mar 31 2015

Shareholders:
Dr. D. Ing ( CPSO# 63916 )
Dr. W. Yoshida ( CPSO# 65165 )

Business Address:
University Health Network
Toronto General Campus
P M C C 3-522
150 Gerrard Street West
Toronto ON  M5G 2C4
Phone Number: (416) 340-5237

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Mount Sinai Hospital Toronto
University Health Network,Toronto General Hospital Site Toronto
University Health Network,Toronto Western Hospital Site Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective: 02 Jun 1998 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. DOUGLAS JEFFREY ING may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. ING is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 17 Jun 1991 to 15 Jun 1992
Other - Comprehensive Internship

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1992 to 30 Jun 1993
Resident 2 - Internal Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1993 to 30 Jun 1994
Resident 3 - Internal Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 17 Jun 1991
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 14 Sep 1992