Ing, Edsel Bill (CPSO#: 59654)

Current Status: Active Member as of 13 Jun 1988

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 04 Jul 1989

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: Cantonese, English

Education:University of Toronto, 1988

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Toronto East General Hospital
(Michael Garron Hospital)
Suite 306 K wing
650 Sammon AVe
Toronto ON  M4C 5M5
Phone: (416) 465-7900
Fax: (416) 465-2035
Electoral District: 10
Find more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

Department Of Ophthalmology
Hospital For Sick Childrren
555 University Avenue
Toronto ON  M5G 1X8
Canada
Phone: (416) 813-8606
Fax: (416) 813-8266
County: City of Toronto
Electoral District: 10
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Edsel Ing Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Sep 22 2005

Shareholders:
Dr. E. Ing ( CPSO# 59654 )

Business Address:
Toronto East General Hospital
K306 - 650 Sammon Avenue
Toronto ON  M4C 5M5
Phone Number: (416) 465-7900

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Hospital For Sick Children Toronto
Michael Garron Hospital - Toronto East Health Network Toronto
Sunnybrook Health Sciences Centre Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Ophthalmology Effective: 24 Oct 1994 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. EDSEL BILL ING may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. ING is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

University of Toronto, 13 Jun 1988 to 12 Jun 1989
Other - Comprehensive Internship

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1990 to 30 Jun 1991
Resident 2 - Ophthalmology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1991 to 30 Jun 1992
Resident 3 - Ophthalmology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1992 to 30 Jun 1993
Resident 4 - Ophthalmology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 13 Jun 1988
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 04 Jul 1989