Inglis, Frederic Graham (CPSO#: 56278)

Current Status: Expired: Resigned from membership as of 18 Jul 2008

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 18 Jul 2008

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:Dalhousie University, 1955

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
General Surgery Effective: 15 Dec 1960 RCPSC Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Academic Practice Certificate Effective: 21 Aug 1985
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 31 Oct 1985
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 23 Dec 1988
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 18 Jul 2008