Inglis, Gabrielle Eva (CPSO#: 106045)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2015

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 19 Jun 2017

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:McMaster University, 2015

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
St Michaels Hospital
St Jamestown Health Centre
Main Floor
410 Sherbourne Street
Toronto ON  M4X 1K2
Phone: 4168643096
Electoral District: 10

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 14 Jun 2017 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. GABRIELLE EVA INGLIS may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. INGLIS is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2015 to 30 Jun 2016
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2016 to 30 Jun 2017
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2015
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 19 Jun 2017