Ingram, Alistair John (CPSO#: 62209)

Current Status: Active Member as of 15 Jun 1990

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 19 Jul 1991

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, French

Education:The University of Western Ontario, 1990

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
St Joseph's Healthcare
3rd Floor Marian Wing
50 Charlton Avenue East
Hamilton ON  L8N 4A6
Phone: (905) 521-6151
Fax: (905) 521-6153
Electoral District: 04
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Alistair John Ingram Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Dec 13 2002

Shareholders:
Dr. A. Ingram ( CPSO# 62209 )

Business Address:
M342 - 50 Charlton Avenue East
Hamilton ON  L8N 4A6
Phone Number: (905) 521-6151

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Brant Community Healthcare System Brantford
Hamilton Health Sciences Centre McMaster & Childrens Hosp,McMaster & Children's Hospital Hamilton
Hamilton Health Sciences,General Site Hamilton
Hamilton Health Sciences,Juravinski Hospital and Cancer Centre Hamilton
Oakville Trafalgar Memorial Hospital Oakville
St Joseph's Healthcare System,Hamilton Hamilton

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective: 30 Jun 1994 RCPSC Specialist
Nephrology Effective: 08 Sep 1995 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. ALISTAIR JOHN INGRAM may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. INGRAM is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

The University of Western Ontario, 15 Jun 1990 to 14 Jun 1991
Other - Comprehensive Internship

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 1991 to 30 Jun 1992
Resident 2 - Internal Medicine

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 1992 to 30 Jun 1993
Resident 3 - Internal Medicine

McMaster University, 01 Jul 1993 to 30 Jun 1994
Resident 4 - Nephrology

McMaster University, 01 Jul 1994 to 30 Jun 1995
Resident 5 - Nephrology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 15 Jun 1990
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 19 Jul 1991